Shah v. Wingo et al

Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Defendant: Michelle Wingo, C V Rivera, J Relvas and Mullens
Case Number: 2:2015cv00004
Filed: January 8, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the three Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Dispositions 85 , 89 and 93 as this Court's findings in all respects; granting defendants' 80 motion for partial summary judgment; d ismissing without prejudice plaintiff Vivek Shah's claims against defendant Summer Birkhead; dismissing Mr. Shah's Federal Torts Claims Act claims against defendant United States of America as outlined; granting defendant Michelle Wingo 9;s 90 motion for partial summary judgment; dismissing with prejudice Mr. Shah's claims against Ms. Wingo; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/12/2016. (ljb)
December 8, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting both sides respond to this Court's order to submit additional pleadings by 1/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/8/2015. (lej)
October 29, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to compel and supplement to the motion to compel 71 74 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/29/2015. (lej)
June 8, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 43 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying Mr. Shah's 15 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/08/2015. (rhm)
May 18, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 33 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Vivek may proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defendants Michelle Wingo, Summer Birkhead, and the Unit ed States of America (via the Federal Tort Claims Act). The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Mr. Shah's state law claims and dismisses those claims without prejudice. Should he choose to do so, Mr. Shah may pursue thes e claims in Arkansas state court. The Court dismisses all other claims without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Although the Court has carefully considered Mr. Shah's arguments, the Court adopts Judge Vol pe's decision to deny Mr. Shah's 40 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint for the reasons stated in his Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/18/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Wingo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C V Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Relvas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?