Powers v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Thomas W Powers
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Danny Burl, Dover and Matthew Parsons
Case Number: 2:2015cv00019
Filed: February 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Powers's claims against all defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice based on sovereign immunity. Powers's claims against Hobbs, Burl, and Dover in their individual capacities are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Powers's claims against Parsons in his individual capacity are dismissed without prejudice for lack of service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2015. (jak)
June 4, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On de novo review, the Court adopts the partial recommendation, 18 , and overrules Powers's objection, 26 . Defendants' motion to dismiss, 11 , is granted in part and denied in part. Powers's claims against all defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. His claims against Hobbs, Burl, and Dover are dismissed without prejudice for lack of exhaustion. Powers may proceed with his claims against Parsons, individually. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/4/2015. (jak)
February 12, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for each of the named Defendants. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, with any attachments, and a summons for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Service for Defendants should be through the ADC Compliance Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/12/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?