Hastings v. May et al

Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Hastings
Defendant: Bobby May, Glen Ramsey and J R Kersery
Case Number: 2:2015cv00048
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Hastings's 6 amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 02/25/2016. (rhm)
January 25, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Hastings to update his address and respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss, 17 , by 24 February 2016. If he doesn't, then his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/25/2016. (jak)
July 9, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Hastings's First Amendment claim may proceed along with his Eighth Amendment claim alleging excessive force. The Court directs the Clerk to file a copy of Hastings's initial complaint, 2 , as an exhibit to his amended complaint, 6 , so the two can be read together going forward. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/9/2015. (jak)
June 25, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In its recent Order, 4 , the Court intended to include directions to the U.S. Marshals about service. The Court directs the Marshals to serve the summons, the complaint, the Court's 19 June 2015 Order, and this Order on Bobby May, Glen Ramsey, and J.R. Kersery. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/25/2015. (jak)
June 19, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Hastings to file an amended complaint by 20 July 2015 that states specifically how his religious beliefs were violated by the DNA sample. A failure to do so will result in the dismissal of his claim without prejudice. Hastings has sta ted an excessive force claim under the Eighth Amendment based on defendants' allegedly unprovoked use of mace. That claim will be allowed to proceed, but his First and Fourth Amendment claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court i s directed to prepare and issue summons for defendants May, Ramsey, and Kersery, without prepayment of fees and security. A copy of this Order and Hastings' complaint should be included with the summons. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J R Kersery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?