Manley v. DeVazier

Plaintiff: Shawn DeVazier Manley
Defendant: Thomas Bradley DeVazier
Case Number: 2:2015cv00054
Filed: April 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 26:6212
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Manley's complaint is dismissed without prejudice because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1331. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/5/2015. (jak)
April 23, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Manley's motion for a temporary restraining order, 3 , is noted. First, the Court has doubts about its subject matter jurisdiction. Manley should file a brief addressing that point by 27 April 2015. Second, there does not appear to be an y imminent irreparable harm in prospect. The Court declines to act until subject matter jurisdiction can be addressed. DeVazier must file an expedited response to the motion for injunctive relief, and address jurisdiction, by 30 April 2015. Because D eVazier hasn't answered or other appeared, the Court orders Manley to send DeVazier's lawyer a copy of this Order today by email, facsimile, and U.S. mail. Manley should file proof of service by tomorrow, 24 April 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/23/2015. (jak)
April 10, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Manley's request for immediate injunctive relief, which is embedded in her complaint, is denied without prejudice. Local Rule 7.2(e). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley v. DeVazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn DeVazier Manley
Represented By: Edward T. Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bradley DeVazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?