Bell v. Randols et al

Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Bell
Defendant: Phil Randols, Jody Ankins and Brandon Brown
Case Number: 2:2015cv00143
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Woodruff
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Bell's medical care claims against Phil Reynolds and Jody Akins are dismissed with prejudice. Bell's grievance claim against Reynolds, and all of Bell's claims against Brandon Brown, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2016. (jak)
November 30, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Partial Recommendation. Bell's grievance claim against Randols and all his claims against Brown are dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2015. (ks)
November 3, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Recommendation. Bell must comply with the Court's Order, 3 , by 4 December 2015. If he fails to do so, his case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court returns the case to Magistrate Judge Volpe. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Randols et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Randols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Ankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?