Coffey v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenny Coffey |
Defendant: |
Wendy Kelly, Rory Griffin, Robert Stevie, Steven Floss, CCS Solutions, Amy Rowland, Bret Butler and Tammy Kimble |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00157 |
Filed: |
September 28, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Helena Office |
County: |
Lee |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia S. Harris |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Leon Holmes |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 27, 2017 |
Filing
72
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 71 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/2017. (ljb) Modified on 6/27/2017 to correct typo (ljb).
|
February 3, 2017 |
Filing
61
ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 59 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting the 39 motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendants CCS, Stieve, Flos s, Butler, and Kimble; and granting the 42 motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendants Kelley and Griffin. Coffey's claims against Stieve and Kimble are dismissed without prejudice, and any claims against CCS, Floss, and Butler, o ther than the exhausted claims identified in the recommendation, are dismissed without prejudice. Coffey's claims against Kelley are dismissed without prejudice, and any claims against Griffin, other than the exhausted claims identified in the recommendation, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/2017. (ljb)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 48 findings and recommendation from Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris as this Court's findings in all respects; and denying the 16 motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by defendants Wendy Kelley and Rory Griffin. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/2016. (ljb)
|
April 4, 2016 |
Filing
36
ORDER adopting 33 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris; plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction and for protective order are denied 4 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/4/16. (tjb)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
3
ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the Helena Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/2015. (jak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?