Cole v. Butler et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie Wayne Cole
Defendant: Quible Butler, Crowley, Mansfield, Mary Fletcher and Dunn
Case Number: 2:2015cv00170
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice 42 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/24/2016. (lej)
February 17, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 35 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; and dismissing without prejudice Defendant Crowley pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/17/2016. (ljb)
February 10, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide a viable address for Defendant Fletcher within 30 days of this order's entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/10/2016. (lej)
January 4, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition. Defendants' 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Defendants Quible Butler, Melissa Mansfield and Monica Dunn area DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk o f Court shall alter the docket to reflect that Defendant "Mansfield" is "Melissa Mansfield" and Defendant "Dunn" is "Monica Dunn." The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/4/2016. (mcz)
November 2, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendant Chew and Plaintiff's claims for failure to change his bandages are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to s tate a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is DENIED. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/2/2015. (ks)
October 15, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendants Butler, Crowley, Mansfield, Fletcher, and Dunn without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/15/2015. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Wayne Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quible Butler
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansfield
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?