Williams v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Frankie Williams
Defendant: Rory Griffin, Jeffery Stevie, Brett Butler, Amy Rowland and Correct Care Solution
Case Number: 2:2015cv00180
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants' 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's allegations against Defendants Butler and Stieve are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall correct the docket to reflect the correct name of Defendant Stieve. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/4/2016. (mcz)
June 6, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommendations in their entirety. Defendant Rowland's 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Rowland is DISMISSED without prejudice from Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/6/2016. (mcz)
February 19, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 3 , 26 and 36 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/19/2016. (mcz)
December 14, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Defendants Griffin and Correct Care Solution are DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/14/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Stevie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?