Piker v. USA et al

Plaintiff: James Ray Piker
Defendant: USA, Federal Bureau of Prisons and C V Rivera
Case Number: 2:2015cv00183
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 47 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/10/2017. (ljb)
September 2, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety the 32 proposed findings and recommendations; granting Defendants' 27 motion to dismiss; dismissing Plaintiff's Bivens claims; and dismissing without prejudice Defendants Bushaw, Winbush, and Does for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/2016. (ljb)
May 3, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 13 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety; dismissing Defendants Federal Bureau of Prisons, Rivera, and Andrews for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and dismissing Plaintiff's claims pursuant to the ADA for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/3/2016. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piker v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ray Piker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C V Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?