Muldrow v. Bureau of Prisons et al

Plaintiff: Lealon Muldrow
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons and Does
Case Number: 2:2015cv00203
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety the 47 proposed findings and recommendations; and denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/2016. (ljb)
May 25, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 36 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety; granting defendant Lam's 26 motion to dismiss, and he is dismissed from plaintiff's complaint; and denying plaintiff's 30 motion to amend. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/25/2016. (ljb)
March 25, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING in full 14 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Lealon Muldrow's claims against the Bureau of Prisons are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/25/2016. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muldrow v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lealon Muldrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?