Ellis v. Drummond

Plaintiff: Tyrone Ellis
Defendant: Patrick Drummond
Case Number: 2:2016cv00042
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 41 Recommendation. Drummond's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Ellis's complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2016. (jak)
June 29, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Jude Volpe's recommendation 18 ; and overrules Ellis's objection 19 ; Ellis's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/16. (tjb)(VACATED pursuant to 22 Order)
April 19, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendant's motion to vacate Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 9 . The order granting Plaintiff in forma pauperis status is vacated and Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is revoked 3 . The motion is denied in all other respects. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must tender the full filing fee of $400 within 14 days of this order's entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/19/2016. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Drummond
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?