Burke v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Stanley K Burke
Defendant: Rory Griffin, Drummond and Amy Roland
Case Number: 2:2016cv00104
Filed: August 8, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Izard
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 32 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/30/2017. (ljb)
December 14, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 21 Findings and Recommendations as this Court's findings in all respects; and granting Patrick Drummond and Amy Roland's 17 motion to dismiss. Stanley K. Burke's claims against Drummond and Roland are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/2016. (ljb)
September 19, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 6 findings and recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects; and denying the 4 petition for alternative public service work and/or dismissal of fine filed by plaintiff Stanley K. Burke. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/19/2016. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley K Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?