B&L Farms Partnership et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: B&L Farms Partnership, Double A Farms, NJ&B Partnership, Neil Culp, Allen Culp, Pam Culp, Jill Culp, Ronnie George, R P George, Brian Chastain Farms, Josh Bartlett, Randle Foran, Borderline Farms JV and Wilson Application LLC
Defendant: Monsanto Company, BASF SE and BASF Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv00122
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction given the transfer of this case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, Doc. 41 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2021. (jak)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER noting 43 motion. Update on settlement of class claims appreciated. Because of the transfer 41 , this Court is unsure whether it has authority to act as requested. The Court therefore requests the parties' thoughts, either by joint report or further briefing on the motion. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/2020. (wbb)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 8 Motion to transfer. This case is transferred immediately to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/15/2017. (jak)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: All claims against BASF SE are dismissed without prejudice, as stipulated. No. 38 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/2017. (jak)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Plaintiffs' deadlines to respond to No. 28 , No. 30 , and No. 32 are extended(without objection) to 10/2/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/5/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&L Farms Partnership et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&L Farms Partnership
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double A Farms
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NJ&B Partnership
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Culp
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Culp
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Culp
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Culp
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie George
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R P George
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chastain Farms
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Bartlett
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randle Foran
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Borderline Farms JV
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Application LLC
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: A. Elizabeth Blackwell
Represented By: Daniel C. Cox
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Masson
Represented By: Jan Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Sarah DeLoach
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Sarah DeLoach
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?