Gonzalez v. Beasley
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Defendant: Gene Beasley
Case Number: 2:2017cv00129
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/22/2019. (jak)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Motion for reconsideration. The 10/24/2017 Order and Judgment stand. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2017. (jak)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT: Gonzalez's petition is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/24/2017. (jak)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion. Objections due by 10/2/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?