Irvin v. Hendrix et al

Plaintiff: Jermaine Duane Irvin
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix, Jeff Sessions, Joshua Burgess, C V Rivera, Shawn Smith, Gene Beasley, S Roberts and Dee Anderson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00179
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Patricia S Harris
1 Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 LEGAL and Lawful Notice by Jermaine Duane Irvin. (llg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court by Jermaine Duane Irvin. (ljb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Irvin's petition is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/7/2019. (jak)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 Recommendation. #4 Motion to Amend is denied, and #1 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis denied as moot. The petition will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/7/2019. (jak)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jermaine Duane Irvin. (kdr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case be dismissed sua sponte; #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be denied; and all requested relief should be denied, and judgment entered for the respondents. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/18/2018. (kdr)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jermaine Duane Irvin.(kdr)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine Duane Irvin. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin v. Hendrix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C V Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Duane Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?