Pena-Gonzalez v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Pena-Gonzalez
Defendant: Ashburn, Hallmark and USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00004
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Brian S Miller
1 Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Hallmark served on 2/28/2019. (fjg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ashburn served on 2/28/2019. (fjg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney Eastern District of AR served on 2/28/2019. (fjg)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 9 Text Entry Only Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature date as 2/14/2019 pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to amend #8 . Plaintiff's motion to amend seeks to improperly supplement his complaint. The Court is sensitive to the fact that pro se litigants like Plaintiff are not trained in the law and will give deference to a pro se plaintiff where the law requires. However, all parties, including pro se litigants, must comply with the substantive and procedural law. Brown v Frey,806 F.2d801, 804 (8th Cir. 1986). Accordingly, the Court will only consider claims properly pled in a complaint or in a superseding amended complaint and will not consider claims stated in notices or other pleadings not filed in compliance with the F.R.C.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/14/2019. (lej) (Docket text modified on 2/27/2019 to correct the signature date of the Order) (jak)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Nicholas Pena-Gonzalez. (ljb)
February 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare Summons for Defendants United States of America, Ashburn, and Hallmark and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the #1 Complaint, Summons, and this Order on Defendants, the United States Attorney for this district, and the United States Attorney General, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therfore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/12/2019. (ljb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the FCI-FC Warden. Service will be issued in a separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/12/2019. (ljb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicholas Pena-Gonzalez. (kdr)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $400 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/29/2019. (lej)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicholas Pena-Gonzalez. (ljb)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $400 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/15/2019. (lej)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Nicholas Pena-Gonzalez. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena-Gonzalez v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Pena-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?