Penn-Star Insurance Company v. Heritage Hospitality Inc et al
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Defendant: Dana Carlson, Samina Zameer, MJ Kelly Company, April James, Toni Frazier Insurance Agency LLC, MJ Kelly of Arkansas Inc and Heritage Hospitality Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00018
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dana Carlson, April James.(Noland, Ross)
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Noland on behalf of Dana Carlson, April James (Noland, Ross)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #21 Amended Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #1 Complaint. (jak)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim,, by Penn-Star Insurance Company.(Butler, Roger)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim,, by MJ Kelly Company.(Littleton, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MJ Kelly Company.(Littleton, David) (Docket text modified on 4/9/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MJ Kelly of Arkansas Inc.(Littleton, David)
April 4, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 2:18-cv-00034-BSM, per #19 Order. (cmn)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Defendant Heritage Hospitality, Inc.'s motion to consolidate this case with Penn-Star Insurance Co. v. Heritage Hospitality, et al., Case No. 2:18-cv-34 BSM. 2:18-cv-34 is designated as the lead case and the stay entered in that case will now apply to both cases. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/4/2019. (kdr)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim,, by MJ Kelly of Arkansas Inc.(Littleton, David)
March 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #17 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as Heritage Hospitality Inc and Samina Zameer as marked on the document. (jak)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy O. Dudley on behalf of Heritage Hospitality Inc and Samina Zameer. (Dudley, Timothy) (Docket text modified on 3/26/2019 to correct the party filers) (jak)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Heritage Hospitality Inc, Samina Zameer. (Easley, Austin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Heritage Hospitality Inc, Samina Zameer (Easley, Austin)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed against Penn-Star Insurance Company. (thd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary B. Rogers on behalf of Toni Frazier Insurance Agency LLC (Rogers, Gary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM against Penn-Star Insurance Company, filed by Samina Zameer, Heritage Hospitality Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Easley, Austin) (Docket text modified on 3/18/2019 to indicate the counterclaim is filed against Penn-Star Insurance Company.) (thd).
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/14/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/28/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 3/16/2020 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/13/19. (lp)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dana Carlson, April James by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Document Wiaver of Service of Summons by Dana Carlson, #2 Document Waiver of Service of Summons by April James)(Butler, Roger)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Heritage Hospitality Inc, Samina Zameer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Easley, Austin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin H. Easley on behalf of Heritage Hospitality Inc, Samina Zameer (Easley, Austin)
March 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Toni Frazier Insurance Agency LLC.(Wooten, Todd)
March 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wooten on behalf of Toni Frazier Insurance Agency LLC (Wooten, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing this case be transferred to the docket of Chief United States District Judge Brian S. Miller as it is related to Penn-Star Insurance Company v. Heritage Hospitality, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:18-cv-00034-BSM; and directing the Clerk of the Court to make the necessary chip exchange to transfer the case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/21/2019. (cmn)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MJ Kelly Company, MJ Kelly of Arkansas Inc.(Littleton, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Littleton on behalf of MJ Kelly Company, MJ Kelly of Arkansas Inc (Littleton, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger N. Butler, Jr on behalf of Penn-Star Insurance Company (Butler, Roger)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070848. No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn-Star Insurance Company v. Heritage Hospitality Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Carlson
Represented By: Ross Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samina Zameer
Represented By: Austin H. Easley
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJ Kelly Company
Represented By: David A. Littleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April James
Represented By: Ross Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Frazier Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: Todd Wooten
Represented By: Gary B. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJ Kelly of Arkansas Inc
Represented By: David A. Littleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Hospitality Inc
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: Austin H. Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger N. Butler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?