Smart v. Hughes Arkansas, City of
Plaintiff: Robert Smart
Defendant: Hughes Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Substituted Complaint and to Join Parties by Robert Smart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended and Substituted Complaint)(Sanford, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Robert Smart Consent to Join -- Terry Ross Riggs (Sanford, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Robert Smart Consent to Join -- Johnathan Jackson (Sanford, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM filed by Robert Smart to #1 Complaint,. Consent to Join -- Robert Smart (Sanford, Joshua)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Hughes Arkansas, City of.(LaFever, Amanda)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda LaFever on behalf of Hughes Arkansas, City of (LaFever, Amanda)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as "ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION" as marked on the document. (cmn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Robert Smart against Hughes Arkansas, City of. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT071826. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Docket text modified on 4/22/2019 to correct the description of the document.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart v. Hughes Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smart
Represented By: Stacy Gibson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?