Staszak v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Matthew L Staszak
Defendant: Darlene Gallardo and USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00052
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 motion to proceed in forma pauperis for the purpose of obtaining assistance with service of his lawsuit; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant United States of America and Darlene Gallardo and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summonses, #9 Amended Complaint, and this Order on the United States of America through the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas, the United States Attorney General, and Gallardo at the Forrest City FCI without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; and denying Staszak's request to receive certified mail from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/21/2019. (ljb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Matthew L Staszak. (llg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 motion to amend complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/6/2019. (ljb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Matthew L Staszak. (kdr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew L Staszak. (ljb)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Staszak to amend his complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order to clarify what rights he alleges have been violated to form the basis of his FTCA claim and Bivens claim; directing the Clerk to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Staszak; directing Staszak to file an IFP application within 30 days of the date of this Order if he seeks assistance serving the defendants; and directing the Clerk to forward Staszak an IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/28/2019. (jbh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number LIT072214. (llg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint by Matthew L Staszak. (ljb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order; and directing Staszak to return a completed IFP application or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/10/2019. (ljb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Matthew L Staszak. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staszak v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew L Staszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?