Doering v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Alan Doering
Defendant: Cambell, Correct Care Solutions, Rory Griffin, Greg Rechcigl and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00053
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting #7 Partial Recommendation and overruling #9 Objections. Doering's claims against CCS and Kelley are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2019. (jak)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rory Griffin. (Middleton, Rosalyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rory Griffin (Middleton, Rosalyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalyn L. Middleton on behalf of Rory Griffin (Middleton, Rosalyn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Rory Griffin served on 6/17/2019. (fjg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Emergency Intervention and Order of Professional Treatment by Alan Doering. (kdr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alan Doering. (llg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel and Dismiss unexhausted claims, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 06/10/2019. (lmc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by Alan Doering. (kdr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION to Dismiss Unexhausted Claims by Alan Doering. (kdr)
May 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Cambell, Rory Griffin and Greg Rechcigl. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #1 and #4 Defendants Correct Care Solutions and Kelley be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/30/2019. (lmc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/30/2019. (lmc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account; directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Rory Griffin, Greg Rechcigl, and Cambell; directing the USMS to serve a copy of #4 Amended Complaint and summons; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to Warden of the EARU and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/30/2019. (kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Alan Doering.(kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alan Doering. (kdr)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff Doering to either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with an Amended Complaint, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/15/2019. (kdr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Alan Doering. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doering v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rechcigl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?