Goodwin v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Mae Ola Goodwin
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and 21st Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00054
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 7/6/2020. Motions due by 8/6/2020. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/5/2020. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/26/2019. (slb)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The Court notes the parties' joint 26(f) report, No. #12 . The Court will adopt the proposed December deadline for pleading amendments. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2019. (slb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Joint Report (Heister, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER:The Court notes the notice of removal and response. And the Court looks forward to working with all counsel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2019. (slb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal by Mae Ola Goodwin (Easley, B.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Addendum. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #4 docket entry to correct the PDF header issues and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida of Additional Pleading (Attachments: #1 Supplement 21st Mortgage's Answer)(Heister, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/27/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/13/2019. (slb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (jbh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #3 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (jbh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Mae Ola Goodwin. (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mae Ola Goodwin. (jbh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, filed by Mae Ola Goodwin. (jbh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida from St. Francis County Circuit Court, case number 62CV-2018-257. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT072142. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: J. Gregory Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Ola Goodwin
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?