Smith v. Frazier
Plaintiff: Beretania Smith
Defendant: Harold Frazier
Case Number: 2:2019cv00066
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/26/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/10/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/19/19. (rmg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #8 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER reserving ruling on #4 Beretania Smith's motion to remand; and directing the parties to engage in jurisdictional discovery over the next 30 days. Harold Frazier will then have 14 days to supplement his response to the motion to remand.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/8/2019. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
July 4, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beretania Smith. (Easley, Austin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Harold Frazier. (Comstock, Christina)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Remand to State Court filed by Beretania Smith. (Easley, Austin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beretania Smith (Easley, Austin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Harold Frazier.(Comstock, Christina)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Harold Frazier, filed by Beretania Smith.(kdr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Jury Demand by Harold Frazier from St. Francis Circuit Court, Case Number 62CV-2019-94-3. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072648. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 6/18/2019 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Frazier
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beretania Smith
Represented By: Austin H. Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?