Edwards v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martha Edwards
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00091
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Bailey Heister terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/31/2020. (rmg)
March 31, 2020 Filing 75 RESPONSE re #74 Scheduling Order, STATEMENT REGARDING NUMBER OF JURORS by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Williams, Thomas)
March 31, 2020 Filing 74 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Discovery due by 9/24/2020; Motions due by 10/19/2020; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/19/2021; Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/31/2020. (rmg)
March 13, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants (Heister, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 72 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Williams, Thomas)
March 4, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to #52 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc.(Williams, Thomas)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER directing the parties to hold a Rule 26(f) conference within 14 days and to submit a report within 21 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/3/2020. (kdr)
March 2, 2020 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Edwards. Wal-Mart Stores East LP served on 2/27/2020. (Hopson, Derek)
February 26, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by Martha Edwards Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Hopson, Derek)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #66 Martha Edward's motion to amend her complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/26/2020. (kdr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 66 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT by Martha Edwards (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hopson, Derek)
February 24, 2020 Summons Issued and returned to plaintiff's counsel as to Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (jap)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #53 motion to dismiss as to Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Walmart, Inc.; denying #53 motion as to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.; dismissing Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Walmart, Inc. without prejudice; and directing Edwards to serve Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. within 30 days, or this case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/29/2020. (jbh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 64 ADDENDUM filed by Martha Edwards to #58 Brief in Support, #57 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Exhibit - Gregory Zovak 20 Year Employee of Walmart (Hopson, Derek)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #62 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/26/2019. (stm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 62 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Martha Edwards (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hopson, Derek)
November 25, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY in Support of #53 Motion to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Walmart Inc. (Docketed pursuant to 60 Order) (kdr)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #59 motion for leave to file reply. The clerk is directed to file the reply. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/2019. (stm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Heister, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 58 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #57 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits To Original Objection To MTD)(Hopson, Derek)
November 12, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Service of Process Easter District of Arkansas, #2 Service of Process Mississippi Federal Court Amended Complaint, #3 Proof of Service Certified Mail, #4 Proof of Service Hand Deliver Walmart Stores, #5 Mississippi Federal Court Docket)(Hopson, Derek)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #55 motion for extension of time to file response re #53 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Response due 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/29/2019. (stm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #54 Brief in Support by Martha Edwards (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email)(Hopson, Derek)
October 14, 2019 Filing 54 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc. (Heister, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc (Heister, Michael)
October 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #52 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed against all Defendants. (thd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Martha Edwards(Hopson, Derek) (Docket text modified on 10/7/2019 to indicate the document is filed against defendants.)(thd).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER staying Case No. 4:19-CV-180 BSM, and directing the parties to make all future filings in Case No. 2:19-CV-91 BSM; directing the clerk to administratively terminate the motions in both cases #26 ; and giving Edwards 14 days to amend the complaint naming correct parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/20/2019. (kdr)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The parties have 14 days in which to either jointly move to consolidate this case with Edwards v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., 4:19-CV-00180 BSM, or to move to dismiss one of the cases. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/21/2019. (kdr)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Britt Virden terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 08/19/2019. (rmg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc (Virden, Britt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc (Virden, Britt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc Re:Notice to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel (Virden, Britt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 45 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/2/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/15/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/1/19. (rmg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Ford on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc (Ford, Brittany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of All Defendants (Heister, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 41 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #40 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER directing the Clerk to show #26 Motion as pending. Judge Miller has agreed to accept transfer, and that would promote judicial economy. The Court therefore directs the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Miller by chip exchange. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2019. (jak)
July 25, 2019 Filing 39 Case electronically transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00138. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 25, 2019 Case Transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE denying as moot #23 Motion to Change Venue; granting #24 Amended Motion to transfer. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/25/19. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss & Supplemental Motion To Motion To Dismiss filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion To Stay Filed In The Eastern District of Arkansas, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion In Support of Motion Stay In The Eastern District of Arkansas) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss Response due by 7/23/2019. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/23/19. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 Supplement to Motion, re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss by Martha Edwards. (Hopson, Derek) Modified on 7/10/2019 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 34 Supplement to Motion re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by WALMART, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Exhibit "4", #5 Exhibit "5", #6 Exhibit "6", #7 Exhibit "7") (Virden, Britt) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint Re: Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, in the Alternative by WALMART, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Virden, Britt) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Reissued as to WALMART, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket 4/16/19) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Martha Edwards. (Hopson, Derek) Modified on 4/16/2019 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Martha Edwards. (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Arkansas , #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by WALMART, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Virden, Britt) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #26 Second MOTION to Dismiss . (Virden, Britt) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 26 Second MOTION to Dismiss by WALMART, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Virden, Britt) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Britt Virden on behalf of WALMART, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Virden, Britt) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Arkansas by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Arkansas by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF Registration Email) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Martha Edwards. (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #15 Motion to Dismiss ; with leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days of this order.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/6/19. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/4/18. (bnd) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Virden, Robert) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
November 25, 2018 Filing 18 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Walmart Press Release) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Re: Supplement to Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Walmart Press Release) (Hopson, Derek) Modified on 12/12/2018 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/31/18. (bnd) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Re: Supplement to Motion to Dismiss re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Virden, Robert) Modified on 10/31/2018 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Dewayne Hopson, Jr on behalf of Martha Edwards Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 8/13/2018. (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Dewayne Hopson, Jr on behalf of Martha Edwards Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 10/23/2018. (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Google Maps Showing The Distance Between Courts) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/10/18. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process Re: Rebuttal in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Virden, Robert) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Hopson, Derek) Modified on 9/27/2018 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process. Responses due by 9/25/2018 (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/17/18. (bds) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process by Martha Edwards. (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process . (Virden, Robert) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Complaint, #2 Exhibit "2" Summons, #3 Exhibit "3" Incident Report, #4 Exhibit "4" Secretary of State Certificates) (Virden, Robert) Modified on 9/4/2018 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
July 6, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1571166, filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Edwards
Represented By: Derek Dewayne Hopson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Britt Virden
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Represented By: Brittany S. Ford
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Britt Virden
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Represented By: Brittany S. Ford
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Britt Virden
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Represented By: Brittany S. Ford
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?