McKuhn v. Hendrix
Plaintiff: Charles A McKuhn, Jr
Defendant: USA and Dewayne Hendrix
Case Number: 2:2019cv00095
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Court accords McKuhn an opportunity to file a reply in which he explains why his petition should not be dismissed for the reason advanced by Hendrix. McKuhn is given up to, and including 10/25/2019, to file his reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the name of the United States of America as the respondent and substitute Hendrix's name as the proper respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/24/2019. (ljb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Pence, Richard)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 request for appointment of counsel, filed as motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/11/2019. (ljb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles A McKuhn, Jr. (kdr)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #1 McKuhn's petition and this order on the Warden of the Federal Correctional Institution and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. Respondent must file an answer, motion, or other response within 21 days after service of the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/3/2019. (ljb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee received $5.00, Receipt # LIT073682. (fjg)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER giving McKuhn up to, and including, 9/2/2019, to either pay the $5 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall send McKuhn the documents necessary to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/30/2019. (ljb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles A McKuhn, Jr.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKuhn v. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A McKuhn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?