Jones v. Hendrix
Plaintiff: Marcus DeAngelo Jones and Marcus DeAngelo Lee
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Case Number: 2:2019cv00096
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (tjb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition by Dewayne Hendrix (Dempsey, Jamie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 PARTIAL OBJECTIONS to #8 Order by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (llg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (ljb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Petitioner Jones's Motion to Expedite Proceedings; granting #7 Petitioner Jones's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying #6 Petitioner Jones's Motion for Leave to Amend his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; directing the Clerk to serve a copy of #1 2241 Petition, #2 Mr. Jones's Affidavit, and this Order, on Respondent and the US Attorney by regular mail; directing Respondent to file the specified Response within 21 days of service; and directing Mr. Jones to file a Reply to the Response within 30 days after the date the Response is filed Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/3/2019. (kdr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (llg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (Attachment: #1 Amended Petition) (llg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Jones an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; directing Jones to, on or before 9/3/2019, either: 1) file the completed Application, including the Certificate of Prisoner Accounts; or 2) pay the $5 filing fee, in full, if he wishes to continue with this action. Service of the Petition is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/31/2019. (kdr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error - wrong image file. The correct document was added to #1 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (llg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT or Declaration by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (llg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marcus DeAngelo Jones. (llg) Additional attachment added on 7/30/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus DeAngelo Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus DeAngelo Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Represented By: Jamie Goss Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?