Fernandez et al v. WTS Express Inc et al
Plaintiff: Margarita Fernandez and Fernando Fernandez
Defendant: WTS Express Inc and Ali A Elkot
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/6/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom #314 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 9/25/2019. (slb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford J. Spicer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spicer, Bradford)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Ali A Elkot, WTS Express Inc. (jbh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Fernando Fernandez, Margarita Fernandez. (jbh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ali A Elkot, WTS Express Inc from St. Francis County Circuit Court, case number 62CV-19-00053. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT073283. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. WTS Express Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Fernandez
Represented By: William T Hackett
Represented By: Bradford J. Spicer
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Fernandez
Represented By: William T Hackett
Represented By: Bradford J. Spicer
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTS Express Inc
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali A Elkot
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?