Conley v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Diane Rose Conley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00103
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Rose Conley re #4 Certificate of Service Office of Regional Counsel (Coleman, Nicholas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diane Rose Conley (Coleman, Nicholas)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the proper parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/12/2019. (ljb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Diane Rose Conley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Diane Rose Conley. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Rose Conley
Represented By: Nicholas Lynn Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?