Dixon v. Hendrix
Plaintiff: Alvin Dixon
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Case Number: 2:2019cv00112
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for additional time to file a response to petition for writ of habeas corpus. Dewayne Hendrix is directed to file his response on or before 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/22/2019. (ljb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time by Dewayne Hendrix (McCord, Stacey)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the clerk to serve a copy of #1 petition, and this Order, on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. The respondent is directed to file an answer, motion or other response to the petition within 21 days after service of this petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/30/2019. (ljb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $5, receipt number LIT073972 (bmd)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Dixon to submit either the $5 filing fee or a properly completed in forma pauperis application no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order; and directing the Clerk to immediately forward an in forma pauperis application to Dixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/6/2019. (ljb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Alvin Dixon. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?