Carter v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: David Carter
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00117
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Carter. Social Security Administration served on 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/24/2019. (jbh)
September 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to plaintiff's counsel for service. (ljb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/16/2019. (ljb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by David Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Carter. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carter
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?