Tomey v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sherry Tomey
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, John Does and Regina Mobley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00139
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Defendant's response will be due fourteen (14) days after the court's entry of the Order on Defendant's motion to strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/2/2020. (amr)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Jones, Kaleb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Sherry Tomey (Attachments: #1 Document Second Amended Complaint)(Reed, Timothy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cotten Cunningham on behalf of Regina Mobley (Cunningham, Joseph)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 CORRECTED CASE NUMBER ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Regina Mobley.(Cunningham, Joseph)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Regina Mobley.(Cunningham, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Response to Motion filed by Sherry Tomey. (Reed, Timothy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Strike #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Sherry Tomey. (Reed, Timothy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Amended Complaint and Summons, filed by Sherry Tomey. Regina Mobley served on 11/21/2019. (Reed, Timothy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Jones, Kaleb)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Kaleb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Strike filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Kaleb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #4 Amended Complaint, by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Jones, Kaleb)
November 20, 2019 Summons Issued to Regina Mobley and returned to counsel for service. (bmd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sherry Tomey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Doe Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Declarations Page, #3 Exhibit Farm Bureau Policy, #4 Exhibit Farm Bureau denial)(Reed, Timothy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (ljb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company filed by Sherry Tomey. (ljb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company from Independence County Circuit Court, Case Number 32CV-19-222. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074694. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomey v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andy Lee Turner
Represented By: Kaleb M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Mobley
Represented By: Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Tomey
Represented By: Timothy Paul Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?