Oakley Grain Inc et al v. Rice et al
Plaintiff: Oakley Grain Inc and Bruce Oakley Inc
Defendant: M Randy Rice, Scott Mears, Scott Mears Farms Inc, Travis Mears Farms Inc, Travis Mears, Seepwater Farms, Harper Ross, John Stephens, Turner Commodities Inc, Benny Bollinger, Stanley Bartlett, Keith Wilkinson, Roger Wilkinson, Bell-Mo Seed, Donnie Wilkinson, David Wilkinson, Donald Wilkinson, Phil Stephens, Gracewood Farms LLC, Agri-Petroleum Sales LLC, Rice Arkansas Inc, Doug Oneal, Martin Walker Reality Partnership, Harper Ross Farms, Josh Oakes, Turner North LLC, Grace AG Partnership, Turner Grain Merchandising Inc, Gene Stock, USA, Gavilon Grain LLC, Rabo AgriFinance Inc, Commodity Credit Corporation, Stokes Mayberry Gin Company Inc, Clint Stephens, Lance Gray, Rice America Inc, Neauman Coleman & Co LLC, Chris Zepponi Triple C Farms, Does John and Jane 1-10, 11-21, 22-52, John Does 53-60, D Faris Buchberger, Brinkley Truck Brokerage LLC, Ivory Rice LLC, Delta Grain Marketing Inc, CC & B Farms, US Department of Agriculture, Agribusiness Properties LLC, Randle Foran and Shirley Crow Stephens
Case Number: 2:2019cv00141
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #5 notice of related case; granting #11 motion to consolidate; directing the parties to make all future filings in Case No. 2:19-CV-00141 BSM; and directing the clerk to close the other cases. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/2020. (jbh)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #14 motion to extend time. Replies due 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/20/2020. (stm)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 motion to extend time. Replies due 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/20/2020. (stm)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Brief. by M Randy Rice (Rice, M.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Scott Mears, Travis Mears, Scott Mears Farms Inc, Travis Mears Farms Inc (Moore, Barrett)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Incorporated Brief filed by Scott Mears, Travis Mears, Scott Mears Farms Inc, Travis Mears Farms Inc. (Moore, Barrett)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Incorporated Brief by Bruce Oakley Inc, Oakley Grain Inc (Hankins, Stuart)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Appellant's BRIEF by Bruce Oakley Inc, Oakley Grain Inc. (Hankins, Stuart)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Scott Mears, Travis Mears, Scott Mears Farms Inc, Travis Mears Farms Inc Response to Notice of Related Case (Moore, Barrett)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bruce Oakley Inc, Oakley Grain Inc re #4 Notice (Other) Amended Designation of The Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal and Statement of The Issues To Be Presented (Hankins, Stuart)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by H. David Blair on behalf of Scott Mears, Travis Mears, Scott Mears Farms Inc, Travis Mears Farms Inc (Blair, H.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamilton Moses Mitchell on behalf of M Randy Rice (Mitchell, Hamilton)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Bruce Oakley Inc, Oakley Grain Inc; Case Number 4:18-cv-00839 (Hankins, Stuart)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Bruce Oakley Inc, Oakley Grain Inc Designation of The Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal and Statement of The Issues To Be Presented (Hankins, Stuart)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. CORRECTION: The Notice of Appeal and #1 Election to Proceed in District Court were added as attachments to docket entry #1 and are attached hereto for review by the parties.(thd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SCHEDULING NOTICE (BANKRUPTCY APPEALS) re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 12/9/2019. Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/12/2019.(ajt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Oakley Grain Inc, Bruce Oakley Inc. Bankruptcy Court case number 2:19-ap-01015. (Attachments: #1 8th Circuit Docket Sheet, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Complaint Exhibits, #5 Answer by Defendant Rice, #6 Answer by Defendants, #7 Order.)(ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #8 Notice of Appeal, #9 Election to Proceed in District Court) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley Grain Inc et al v. Rice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley Grain Inc
Represented By: Fletcher C. Lewis
Represented By: Stuart W. Hankins
Represented By: Allen Vaughan Hankins
Represented By: Randall D. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Oakley Inc
Represented By: Fletcher C. Lewis
Represented By: Stuart W. Hankins
Represented By: Allen Vaughan Hankins
Represented By: Randall D. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Randy Rice
Represented By: Hamilton Moses Mitchell
Represented By: M. Randy Rice
Represented By: Kathryn Gillian Reid
Represented By: Thomas S. Streetman
Represented By: Shannon Smith Thomas
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Represented By: Gregory H. Bevel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mears
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Represented By: H. David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mears Farms Inc
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Represented By: H. David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Mears Farms Inc
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Represented By: H. David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Mears
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Represented By: H. David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seepwater Farms
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harper Ross
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stephens
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Commodities Inc
Represented By: Brooks A. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Bollinger
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell-Mo Seed
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Stephens
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gracewood Farms LLC
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri-Petroleum Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Oneal
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Walker Reality Partnership
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harper Ross Farms
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Oakes
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner North LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace AG Partnership
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Grain Merchandising Inc
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Represented By: Rachel V. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Stock
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavilon Grain LLC
Represented By: Stanley Dale Smith
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabo AgriFinance Inc
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodity Credit Corporation
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stokes Mayberry Gin Company Inc
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Stephens
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice America Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neauman Coleman & Co LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Zepponi Triple C Farms
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does John and Jane 1-10, 11-21, 22-52, John Does 53-60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Faris Buchberger
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinkley Truck Brokerage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivory Rice LLC
Represented By: Daniel Todd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Grain Marketing Inc
Represented By: R. Bryant Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC & B Farms
Represented By: P. Scott Phillips
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness Properties LLC
Represented By: Daniel Todd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randle Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Crow Stephens
Represented By: Justin M. Stephens
Represented By: Jesse Joe Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?