Shelton v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Monty M Shelton
Defendant: USA and Does Unknown Officers, Forrest City FCI
Case Number: 2:2019cv00145
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant United States of America without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Plaintiff must file a "Motion for Service," as specified herein, within 90 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/30/2019. (lej)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/30/2019. (lej)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Letter re #3 IFP from Monty Shelton. (ljb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Monty M Shelton. (ljb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $400 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/18/2019. (lej)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Monty M Shelton. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Unknown Officers, Forrest City FCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty M Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?