Pryor v. Hagler et al
Plaintiff: Rayford Pryor, Jr
Defendant: Len Hagler, Bryan Earls, Lance Perry, Brandon Sutton, Robert Graves, Jo Kelly, Rayfield Isreal, John Paul Richardson, David West and Matt Melton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00146
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Rayford Pryor, Jr re #4 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. (fjg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Rayford Pryor, Jr re #3 Case electronically transferred in from District of Iowa Southern. (fjg)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying motion to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice; directing the Clerk to send plaintiff another IFP application along with a copy of this Order; plaintiff is directed to (1) complete and sign the IFP application; (2) have an authorized jail/prison official complete and sign the trust fund certificate and calculation sheet; and (3) return all forms to the Clerk by 1/3/20; if plaintiff fails to do so his case will be dismissed without prejudice #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/4/19. (tjb)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case electronically transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00367. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Transferring Case. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, Eastern Division. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/22/2019. Copy of Order mailed by chambers to pro se Plaintiff. (hfh) [Transferred from iasd on 11/26/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 11/26/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rayford Pryor, Jr. (don) [Transferred from iasd on 11/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor v. Hagler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Len Hagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayfield Isreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayford Pryor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?