Manning v. Reed et al
Plaintiff: Travis Manning
Defendant: Angelia Jenkins, Morieon Kelly, Jeremy Andrews, Roosevelt Barden, Fidel A Cobb, Marshall Dale Reed, Does, Wendy Kelley, Raymond Naylor and Jeffery Deen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00147
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the January 3, 2020 Order denying his Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint as instructed in the December 2, 2019 and January 3, 2020 Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/16/20. (pdw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration of #14 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Status Update. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/14/20. (pdw)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Status by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #12 Motion for Extension of Time, and #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/07/2020. (ajt)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension; and denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/3/2020. (jbh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Travis Manning. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Manning. (llg)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court by Travis Manning. (ljb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Manning. (llg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint by Travis Manning. (llg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Travis Manning. (ljb)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this order to ADC Compliance Office, ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/02/2019. (ajt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong division in heading). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/02/2019. (lmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Travis Manning. (llg)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Manning. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelia Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morieon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Barden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel A Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Dale Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Deen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?