Terry v. Lane et al
Plaintiff: Jarell D Terry
Defendant: Baine, John Doe, Lane, Maiden, Williams, Baxter, Alicia Williams, Devine Maiden, Sydney Larry and Kathey Baxter
Case Number: 2:2019cv00153
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/6/2020. (csf)
February 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint by Jarell D Terry. (Attachment: #(1) Proposed Amended Complaint) (llg)
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that #7 MOTION for injunctive relief filed by Jarell D Terry be denied. Objections due within 14 days of Recommendation. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the names of Defendants Sidney Larry, Kathey Baxter, Devine Maiden and Alicia Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/30/2020. (csf) (Docket text modified on 2/6/2020 to include a reference to the name changes.) (thd).
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Baxter, Larry, Maiden, Williams.(Adkins, Reid)
January 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Phillip Adkins on behalf of Baxter, Larry, Maiden, Williams (Adkins, Reid)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 motion for copies; directing the Clerk of Court to send Mr. Terry copies of all the documents filed in this case; granting #12 motion to dismiss Defendant Lane from this lawsuit; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Terry's claims against Defendant Lane; and directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate Defendant Lane as a party Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/21/2020. (jbh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 MOTION for Copies. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was attached to docket entry #11 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Baxter served on 1/6/2020. (fjg)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Maiden served on 1/6/2020. (fjg)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Larry served on 1/6/2020. (fjg)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Williams served on 1/6/2020. (fjg)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Jarell D Terry. (kdr)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Copies by Jarell D Terry. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION in Support of #7 Motion for TRO filed by Jarell D Terry. (llg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #6 Partial Recommended Disposition by Jarell D Terry. (llg)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION in Support of #7 Motion for TRO filed by Jarell D Terry. (kdr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jarell D Terry. (kdr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Terry's claims of denial of access to the courts and his claims of inadequate medical care be dismissed, without prejudice. If those claims are dismissed, Defendants Lane and Baine should be dismissed as Defendants. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 01/02/2020. (ajt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court by Jarell D Terry. (llg)
December 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Baxter, Larry, Maiden, Williams and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendants Maiden, Baxter, Williams, and Larry; directing the United States Marshal to serve each Defendant with a copy of the #2 Complaint, with any attachments, and a summons without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/23/2019. (jbh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/16/2019. (jbh)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jarell D Terry. (ljb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarell D Terry. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarell D Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Williams
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devine Maiden
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Larry
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathey Baxter
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?