White v. Buchanan et al
Plaintiff: Verna White
Defendant: Acutraq Background Screening Inc, Forrest City Housing Corporation, Tenant Screening for Landlords and Tenant Searchers, Christopher B Buchanan and Forrest City Housing Corporation doing business as Forrest City Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2019cv00163
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #20 Motion for Extension of Time lacks a correct case number (Local Rule 5.5(a)). (jak)
February 13, 2020 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to FCHA's Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint by Verna White (Waldrip, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Forrest City Housing Corporation. (Young, Kimberly)
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Scott Ritter on behalf of Acutraq Background Screening Inc (Ritter, Glenn)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Response to Motion Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Acutraq Background Screening Inc. (Baker, Adrienne)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Acutraq Background Screening Inc. (Baker, Adrienne)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint of Verna White filed by Acutraq Background Screening Inc. (Baker, Adrienne)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint of Verna White by Acutraq Background Screening Inc (Baker, Adrienne)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion" as marked on the document. (jak)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion by Forrest City Housing Corporation (Young, Kimberly)(Docket text modified on 1/24/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Forrest City Housing Corporation (Young, Kimberly)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/25/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/8/2020. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 1/25/2021 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Verna White (Waldrip, Brett)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Verna White filed by Verna White. (Daggett, Jesse)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Verna White(Daggett, Jesse)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Forrest City Housing Corporation to Supplement Record on Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Young, Kimberly)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Verna White filed by Acutraq Background Screening Inc. (Baker, Adrienne)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Verna White by Acutraq Background Screening Inc (Baker, Adrienne)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that any motion the parties wish the Court to address need to be filed in this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/6/2020. (ljb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Verna White. (ljb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT AT LAW with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Verna White. (ljb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Acutraq Background Screening Inc from St Francis County Circuit Court, Case Number CV2019-159-2. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT075298. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Buchanan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acutraq Background Screening Inc
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Glenn Scott Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest City Housing Corporation
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenant Screening for Landlords and Tenant Searchers
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Glenn Scott Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher B Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest City Housing Corporation doing business as Forrest City Housing Authority
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna White
Represented By: Brett Mitchell Waldrip
Represented By: Jesse B. Daggett
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Represented By: Roy C. Lewellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?