Bagley v. Helena West Helena School District et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Andrew Bagley
Defendant: Janice Williams, Lynn Boone, Daniel Strickland, Troy Bobo, Sanetta Davis, Helena West Helena School District, Loistyne Burrell and Earnest Simpson, Jr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00164
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/6/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/20/2020. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/8/2021 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
January 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as All Defendants as marked on the document. (jak)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad J. Beavers on behalf of All Defendants. (Beavers, Brad) (Docket text modified on 1/29/2020 to correct the party filers)(jak).
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George Jay Bequette, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Bequette, George)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Troy Bobo, Lynn Boone, Loistyne Burrell, Sanetta Davis, Helena West Helena School District, Earnest Simpson, Jr, Daniel Strickland, Janice Williams.(Kees, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Nathan Andrew Bagley. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT075311.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley v. Helena West Helena School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Williams
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Boone
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Strickland
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Bobo
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanetta Davis
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena West Helena School District
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loistyne Burrell
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnest Simpson, Jr
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: Brad J. Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Andrew Bagley
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?