Chaunea Jackson v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chaunea Jackson
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, inclusive and Nissan North America Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00010
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-10403. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING The Parties' Stipulation to Delete plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages Without prejudice and Transfer the Case Pursuant to 28 USC setion 1404 #12 . (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas and Delete Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages Without Prejudice filed by defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting the Parties' Stipulation to Delete Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages Without Prejudice and Transfer the Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404, #2 Proof of Service)(Attorney Lisa Ryoko Hsiao added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hsiao, Lisa) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chaunea Jackson, identifying Chaunea Jackson and Nissan North America, Inc.. (Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chaunea Jackson, identifying Chaunea Jackson and Nissan North America, Inc.. (Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Jacqueline Chooljian. New Case Number 2:19-cv-10403-DSF-JCx. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chaunea Jackson. (Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chaunea Jackson. (Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24889453 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Chaunea Jackson. (Attorney Jonathan A Michaels added to party Chaunea Jackson(pty:pla))(Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 1/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaunea Jackson v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Represented By: Lisa Ryoko Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaunea Jackson
Represented By: Jonathan A. Michaels
Represented By: Ryan D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?