Tose v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Larry Tose
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00058
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Discovery due by 3/24/2021; Motions due by 4/19/2021; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 7/16/2021; Status Report due by 4/19/2021. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/24/2020. (rmg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Joint Rule 26F Report (Miller, Stuart)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/27/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/9/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/30/2020. (rmg)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Catherine Vechik on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Vechik, Lindsey)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc, and Corporate Parent LM Insurance Corporation for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (kdr)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(kdr)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (kdr)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Larry Tose.(kdr)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from Phillips County Circuit Court, Case Number CV-20-38. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076534. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tose v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Tose
Represented By: Charles P. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: Lindsey Catherine Vechik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?