Fuller v. Singleton Farms LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Fuller
Defendant: Singleton Farms LLC and Mark Singleton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00082
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/21/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/3/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/15/2020. (rmg)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mark Singleton, Singleton Farms LLC.(Moore, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Moore on behalf of Mark Singleton, Singleton Farms LLC (Moore, Michael)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Michael Fuller. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076822.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Singleton Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singleton Farms LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Singleton
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fuller
Represented By: Lydia Hicks Hamlet
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?