Barnes v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Charles Barnes, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00149
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (ljb)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/12/2020. (ljb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #2 Complaint and coversheet lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5 (c)(1)). (jak)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Charles Barnes, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (cmn).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Barnes, Jr. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Randolph M. Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?