Nash v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patricia Nash
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00185
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/19/2020. (jbh)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Nash re #4 Certificate of Service Return Receipt - OGC (Coleman, Nicholas)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Nash re #4 Certificate of Service Return Receipt - USDA (Coleman, Nicholas)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Nash (Coleman, Nicholas)
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Ms. Nash's counsel to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/2020. (jbh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Patricia Nash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Nash. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Nash
Represented By: Nicholas Lynn Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?