Ross v. Rechcigl et al
Plaintiff: John D Ross
Defendant: Tammi Kimble, Juan Peres, Patrick Drummond, Johnson, Joe Smith, Rory Griffin, Wellpath LLC, Geraldine Campbell, Charlott Gardner, Allison, Gary Kerstein, Tracey Bennett, Kenyon V Randle, Jackson, Jorge Dominicis, Angela Mixon, Jeremy Andrews, Greg Rechcigl, T Munn, James Dycus, James Smith, Angela Douglas, John Smith, Thomas Pangburn, Gaylon Lay, HIG Capital, Albert Norton and Gary R Kerstein
Case Number: 2:2020cv00235
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allison, Jeremy Andrews, James Dycus, Rory Griffin, Gaylon Lay.(Edwards, Brittany)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nicole Edwards on behalf of Allison, Jeremy Andrews, James Dycus, Rory Griffin, Gaylon Lay (Edwards, Brittany)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jeremy Andrews served on 12/18/2020. (bmd)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Rory Griffin served on 12/18/2020. (bmd)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gaylon Lay served on 12/18/2020. (bmd)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. James Dycus served on 12/18/2020. (bmd)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Allison served on 12/18/2020. (bmd)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for ruling #11 . Plaintiff's motion is awaiting final disposition by the presiding district judge. His objections have been filed so the matter has been fully briefed and no further pleadings are necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/4/2021. (lej)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE and Advisement re Corrections to Defendants' Names by John D Ross. (kdr)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Ruling on Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief by John D Ross. (kdr)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OBJECTION to #9 Report and Recommendations by John D Ross. (kdr)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Allison, Jeremy Andrews, Tracey Bennett, Geraldine Campbell, Jorge Dominicis, Patrick Drummond, James Dycus, Charlott Gardner, Rory Griffin, Gary R Kerstein, Gaylon Lay, Angela Mixon, Thomas Pangburn, Juan Peres, Greg Rechcigl, Wellpath LLC and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his claims that from July 3, 2018 to August 23, 2020, Defendants Rechigl, Kerstein, Campbell, Drummond, Bennett, Mixon, Gardner, Wellpath, Dominicis, Peres, Pangburn, Griffin, Andrews, Lay, Dycus, and Allison violated his Eighth Amendment right to receive adequate medical care. Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment and tort of outrage claims be dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Kimble, Douglas, Jackson, Johnson, HIG Capital, John Smith, Joe Smith, Munn, Norton, and Randle be dismissed without prejudice as parties to this lawsuit. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1983, that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/11/2020. (lej)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants Griffin, Andrews, Lay, Dycus, Allison, Rechcigl, Kerstein, Campbell, Drummond, Bennett, Mixon, Gardner, Wellpath, Dominicis, Peres, and Pagburn without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/11/2020. (lej)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for joinder #6 . The amendments he seeks to make are not factually related to pending claims and these claims occurred after this cause of action was initiated. Plaintiff may file a new cause of action with these claims if he chooses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/11/2020. (lej)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE and MOTION for Joinder by John D Ross. (ljb)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to refund Plaintiff the $2 he overpaid on the filing fee. Given the timing of the filing of Plaintiff's cause of action and the change in the filing fee, the fee in this matter shall be $400. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/7/2020. (lej)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/3/2020. (lej)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee received. Amount $402.00, Receipt # LIT079963. (fjg)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John D Ross.(jak)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John D Ross. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Rechcigl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Peres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlott Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyon V Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Dominicis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Andrews
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rechcigl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dycus
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pangburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIG Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R Kerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?