Dowdy v. Protective Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Dowdy
Defendant: Protective Life Insurance Company and Kernodle Funeral Home Inc
Counter Claimant: Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company and Aetna Life Insurance and Annuity Company
Counter Defendant: Carl Lee Andrews, Jr, Trey Andrews, Estate of Carl Lee Andrews and Stephen Andrews
Case Number: 2:2020cv00243
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Mary Hodges is not enrolled to practice in this court; therefore, she cannot represent Kernodle Funeral Home, Inc. Kernodle Funeral Home, Inc. has 30 days to retain new counsel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2021. (kdr)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Easley, B.)(Docket text modified on 1/22/2021 to remove duplicate text) (jak)
January 22, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
January 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Carl Lee Andrews, Jr, Stephen Andrews, Trey Andrews and returned to attorney for Counter Claimant. (jap)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company (Keller, Thomas)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 COUNTERCLAIM IN INTERPLEADER against all Counter Defendants filed by Protective Life Insurance Company, Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company.(fjg)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Protective Life Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Amend/Correct Brief in Support of Defendant Protective Life Insurance Company's Motion to Realign the Parties filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Protective Life Insurance Company's Motion to Realign the Parties by Protective Life Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss Brief in Support of Defendant Protective Life Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Protective Life Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Protective Life Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/14/2020. (rmg)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Protective Life Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Kernodle Funeral Home Inc.(ajt)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Deborah Dowdy.(ajt)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Protective Life Insurance Company from St. Franics County Circuit Court, case number 62CV-20-209-3. Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT080091. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowdy v. Protective Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kernodle Funeral Home Inc
Represented By: Mary Hoshall Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Dowdy
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Aetna Life Insurance and Annuity Company
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Carl Lee Andrews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trey Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Estate of Carl Lee Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stephen Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?