Brokaw v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen L Brokaw
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Case Number: 2:2020cv00252
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (Joint) (Wineland, Teresa)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Baker, Stefan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/7/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/20/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/6/2022 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/28/2021. (rmg)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI.(Wineland, Teresa)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (ajt)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(ajt)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kathleen L Brokaw.(ajt)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18CV-20-569. Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT080292. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brokaw v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stefan Shane Baker
Represented By: Justin Parkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Represented By: Dale W. Brown
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen L Brokaw
Represented By: William Beadle
Represented By: Jeff L. Slaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?