Honeycutt v. Marianna, City of et al
Plaintiff: Alvin Honeycutt
Defendant: Dale Acosta, Jimmy Williams, Daniel Strickland and Marianna, City of
Case Number: 2:2021cv00049
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/7/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/20/2021; Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/6/2021. (ljb)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dale Acosta, Marianna, City of, Daniel Strickland, Jimmy Williams.(Fuqua, David)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/21. (rwk)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file their answers by July 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/21.(rwk)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Stevens on behalf of All Defendants (Stevens, Christopher)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint () by All Defendants (Fuqua, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Fuqua on behalf of All Defendants (Fuqua, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Diane Depper on behalf of All Defendants (Depper, Margaret)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Honeycutt. Marianna, City of served on 5/12/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Honeycutt. Dale Acosta served on 5/12/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Honeycutt. (Sutter, Luther)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Honeycutt. Jimmy Williams served on 5/12/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Honeycutt. (Sutter, Luther)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvin Honeycutt. Daniel Strickland served on 5/12/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Alvin Honeycutt. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082034. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honeycutt v. Marianna, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Acosta
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Christopher Stevens
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Williams
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Christopher Stevens
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Strickland
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Christopher Stevens
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianna, City of
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Christopher Stevens
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Honeycutt
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?