Does v. Palestine-Wheatley School District
Plaintiff: Does J.M. and N.M., as Parents and Next Friends of C.F. and Does J.M. and N.M., on behalf of C.F.
Defendant: Palestine-Wheatley School District
Case Number: 2:2021cv00075
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 motion for extension of time to answer. Palestine-Wheatley School District answer due 9/17/2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/10/21. (rdr)
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint by Palestine-Wheatley School District (Kees, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Palestine-Wheatley School District, filed by Does (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Supplemental Complaint)(Caldwell, Theresa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Stay, and RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Does. (Caldwell, Theresa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Does (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing Officer Final Order, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript - Vol 7 -pp90, 93-94, #3 Exhibit C - District Post Hearing Brief)(Caldwell, Theresa)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Palestine-Wheatley School District. (Kees, William)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Palestine-Wheatley School District (Kees, William)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Thomas Stewart on behalf of Palestine-Wheatley School District (Stewart, Troy)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/29/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/12/2021; Bench Trial set for 2/21/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/27/2021. (ljb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Cody Kees on behalf of Palestine-Wheatley School District (Kees, William)
July 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Plaintiffs' request that the Palestine-Wheatley School District respond to the complaint within 5 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/17/2021. (kdr)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Does. Palestine-Wheatley School District served on 7/14/2021. (Caldwell, Theresa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Palestine-Wheatley School District, filed by Does. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082891. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Does v. Palestine-Wheatley School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does J.M. and N.M., as Parents and Next Friends of C.F.
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does J.M. and N.M., on behalf of C.F.
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palestine-Wheatley School District
Represented By: Troy Thomas Stewart
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?