Bradshaw Family Trust Inc v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bradshaw Family Trust Inc doing business as Hunton Office Supply Inc
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00103
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/19/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/2/2021; Jury Trial set for 10/11/2022 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
August 12, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the original case number as "62-CV-21-10-3" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (llg)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT OF OTT INSURANCE, LLC ONLY. Signed by Circuit Court Judge on 07/28/2021. (llg)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (llg)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Twin City Fire Insurance Company and Ott Insurance LLC filed by Bradshaw Family Trust Inc. (llg)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Twin City Fire Insurance Company from St. Francis County Circuit Court, case number 62-CV-2021-10-3. Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT083262. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) (Docket text modified on 8/12/2021 to correct case number.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradshaw Family Trust Inc v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradshaw Family Trust Inc doing business as Hunton Office Supply Inc
Represented By: Austin H. Easley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: R. Alan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Cara D. Butler
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?