Taylor v. Yates
Plaintiff: Marcus Roosevelt Taylor
Defendant: John P Yates
Case Number: 2:2021cv00112
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss by John P Yates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Shannon)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon S. Smith on behalf of John P Yates (Smith, Shannon)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by mail; and directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/22/2021. (kdr)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00 Received, receipt number LIT083773. (mdo)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send Taylor an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit; and directing Taylor to, on or before 9/24/2021, either: (1) file the completed Application, including the Certificate of Prisoner Accounts; or (2) pay the $5.00 filing fee, in full, if he wishes to continue with this action. Service of the Petition is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/25/2021. (kdr)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marcus Roosevelt Taylor. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Roosevelt Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Yates
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?