Duvall-Kelley v. North Delta Gin Co LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Duvall-Kelley
Defendant: North Delta Gin Co LLC, Brandon Wayne Childress and John Does
Case Number: 2:2021cv00131
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/15/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/29/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 1/23/2023 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Elizabeth Ann Duvall-Kelley. North Delta Gin Co LLC served on 9/18/2021. (Whetstone, Bud)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Elizabeth Ann Duvall-Kelley. Brandon Wayne Childress served on 9/18/2021. (Whetstone, Bud)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brandon Wayne Childress, North Delta Gin Co LLC.(Cissell, Claire)
October 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing party as North Delta Gin Co LLC as indicated by the document. (cmn)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Elizabeth Ann Duvall-Kelley. (llg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Elizabeth Ann Duvall-Kelley from Phillips County Circuit Court, case number 54-cv-21-00127. Fee of $402 paid, receipt # LIT083988. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duvall-Kelley v. North Delta Gin Co LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Duvall-Kelley
Represented By: Bud Bernard Whetstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Delta Gin Co LLC
Represented By: Claire M. Cissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Wayne Childress
Represented By: Claire M. Cissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?